VA SB940 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Montross; November elections, town council. Moves the date of election for the members of the town council from May to November, beginning in 2016.
Title
Montross, Town of; amending charter, moves election date of town council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 83 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB940ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15101502D-E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB940E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101502D |