VA SB933 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Movable Soccer Goal Safety Act created. Requires every organization that owns and controls a movable soccer goal to establish a soccer goal safety and education policy that outlines how the organization will address any safety concern related to movable soccer goals, including the dangers of unanchored or improperly anchored soccer goals tipping over and the care that must be taken to ensure proper installation, setup, maintenance, and transportation of movable soccer goals; prohibits the sale of movable soccer goals that are not tip-resistant beginning July 1, 2014; and requires the Department of Conservation and Recreation and the Division of State Parks to convene a work group to examine safety issues related to moveable soccer goals. This bill contains a reenactment clause.
Title
Movable Soccer Goal Safety Act; created, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 38-N) (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 38-N) (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective -see bill) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB933ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 38-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendment (62-Y 38-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB933 |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #4 |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101564D |