VA SB930 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; network bingo. Authorizes the conduct of a new charitable game known as network bingo. The bill sets out the terms and conditions under which network bingo may be conducted, provides for the licensing of network bingo providers, and sets the maximum prize amount for network bingo. The bill defines the terms "network bingo," "pari-mutuel play," and "network bingo provider." With the exception of the provision requiring the Board of Charitable Gaming to establish regulations, the bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2014. The bill also contains technical amendments.
Title
Charitable gaming; authorizes network bingo.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective - see bill) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB930ER) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N) |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed House (84-Y 13-N) |
2013-02-07 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101793D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.34:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3732.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |