VA SB929 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State agencies; use of third-party commercial carrier for service, delivery, or transmission of notices. Authorizes state agencies under Titles 2.2 and 54.1 of the Code of Virginia to use a third-party commercial carrier when service, delivery, or transmission of any notice or paper is authorized or required to be accomplished by mail, ordinary mail, registered mail, or certified mail. The bill also (i) provides that any applicable requirements in other titles of the Code of Virginia or the Rules of the Supreme Court of Virginia for proof of any service, delivery, or transmission shall remain in effect when a third-party commercial carrier is used and (ii) specifies that where registered or certified mail is required, proof of service must also be required by the third-party commercial carrier. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
State agencies; use of third-party commercial carriers for service, delivery, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 15101155D-E |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15101155D-E |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB929E |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101155D |