VA SB920 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Surrogacy contracts; provisions requiring or prohibiting abortion or selective reduction unenforceable. Provides that any provision of a surrogacy contract requiring or prohibiting an abortion or selective reduction is against the public policy of the Commonwealth and is void and unenforceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surrogacy contracts; provisions requiring abortion or selective reduction unenforceable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenatePrinted as engrossed 20105335D-E
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB920E
2020-02-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2020-01-16SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2020-01-16SenateRereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-09SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105335D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback