VA SB907 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for contraceptives. Requires health carriers to provide coverage, under any health insurance policy, contract, or plan that includes coverage for prescription drugs on an outpatient basis, for any prescribed contraceptive drug or contraceptive device. Currently health carriers are required to offer and make available such coverage. The measure prohibits a health carrier from imposing upon any person receiving contraceptive benefits pursuant to the provisions of the measure any copayment, coinsurance payment, or fee. The measure applies to health insurance contracts, policies, or plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on and after January 1, 2019.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 18106137D-S1 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104374D |