VA SB901 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm in unattended motor vehicle; civil penalty. Provides that no person shall leave, place, or store a handgun in an unattended motor vehicle, as defined in the bill, unless the vehicle is locked. The bill provides that any person violating such prohibition is subject to a civil penalty of no more than $500 and that such unattended motor vehicle may be subject to removal for safekeeping. Firearm in unattended motor vehicle; civil penalty. Provides that no person shall leave, place, or store a handgun in an unattended motor vehicle, as defined in the bill, unless the vehicle is locked. The bill provides that any person violating such prohibition is subject to a civil penalty of no more than $500 and that such unattended motor vehicle may be subject to removal for safekeeping.
Title
Firearm in unattended motor vehicle; civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23103458D-E |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB901E |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103458D |