VA SB899 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Alleghany Highlands. Provides a new charter for the City of Alleghany Highlands, the city to be created by the consolidation of Alleghany County and the City of Covington, if approved by voters.
Title
Charter; City of Alleghany Highlands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 348 (effective 12/31/12 - see bill) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB899ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House (94-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11100130D-E | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB899E | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100130D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1770 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)