VA SB883 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Council on Environmental Justice; established. Establishes the Virginia Council on Environmental Justice, consisting of 27 members, to advise the Governor and provide recommendations intended to protect vulnerable communities from disproportionate impacts of pollution and provide such communities meaningful involvement in the decision-making process. The bill provides that 21 members of the Council are appointed by the Governor and six are specified Cabinet Secretaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Justice, Virginia Council on; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1274)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1274 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB883ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB883ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-27SenateTitle replaced 20108847D-H1
2020-02-27SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House with substitute (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB883H1
2020-02-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108847D-H1
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HouseRead second time
2020-02-20HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108847D-H1
2020-02-20HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2020-01-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB883S1
2020-01-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106392D-S1
2020-01-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-27SenateRead second time
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106392D-S1
2020-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105198D

Same As/Similar To

HB1042 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222699.13(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB883&201+sum+SB883
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB883+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB883S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB883H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB883ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB883ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1274+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0048+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0149SB0883+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0206SB0883+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0400+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1346+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1152SB0883+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1989SB0883+SB0883
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2260+SB0883

Bill Comments

feedback