VA SB880 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
Hearing: Feb 21 in Shared Committee Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum staffing ratio for school counselors. Requires local school boards to employ school counselors in accordance with the following ratios, effective with the 2020%962021 school year: in elementary schools, one hour per day per 75 students, one full-time equivalent at 375 students, one hour per day additional time per 75 students or major fraction thereof; in middle schools, one period per 65 students, one full-time equivalent at 325 students, one additional period per 65 students or major fraction thereof; and in high schools, one period per 60 students, one full-time equivalent at 300 students, one additional period per 60 students or major fraction thereof. The bill also requires local school boards to employ one full-time equivalent school counselor position per 250 students in grades kindergarten through 12, effective with the 2021%962022 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School counselors; minimum staffing ratio.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseReported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102837D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB880E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReconsidered by Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-30SenateReported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N)
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102837D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB880
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB880+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB880E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0084+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0217+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0288+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0591SB0880+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0599SB0880+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0613SB0880+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0216+SB0880
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0203V0033+SB0880

Bill Comments

feedback