VA SB876 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship Guardianship Assistance program. Creates the Kinship Guardianship Assistance program (the program) to facilitate child placements with relatives and ensure permanency for children for whom adoption or being returned home are not appropriate permanency options. The bill sets forth eligibility criteria for the program, payment allowances to kinship guardians, and requirements for kinship guardianship assistance agreements. The bill also requires the Board of Social Services to promulgate regulations for the program. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Kinship Guardianship Assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17102201D-E |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB876E |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102201D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |