VA SB875 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; automated teller machines. Excludes any automated teller machine, cash-dispensing machine, or similar electronic or computer terminal from the definition of a bank's branch office or credit union's service facility. By excluding such items from the scope of what constitutes a bank branch office or credit union service facility, the measure removes the requirement that their locations be approved by the State Corporation Commission (SCC). The measure also removes requirements that (i) in-state banks provide notice to, and receive approval from, the SCC before establishing automated teller machines and (ii) out-of-state banks provide to the SCC a copy of the notice or application, or both, sent to their home state regulator.
Title
Financial institutions; automated teller machines and other terminals, service facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 19 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB875ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB875S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15103805D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15103805D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101708D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1629 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)