VA SB869 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Carbon monoxide emissions; diesel-powered incinerator; exemption. Exempts carbon monoxide emissions of certain diesel-powered incinerators from certain permitting regulations of the State Air Pollution Control Board. An incinerator whose emissions are exempted must be installed prior to July 1, 2015, owned by a locality, and used exclusively for the incineration of animal carcasses collected from public rights-of-way. The provisions of the bill expire on July 1, 2019.
Title
Carbon monoxide emissions; certain diesel-powered incinerators exempted from certain regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB869ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 26-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House (70-Y 26-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 5-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100915D-E |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB869E |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (9-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100915D |