VA SB862 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Driving after forfeiture of license. Provides that a person is guilty of an offense of driving or operating a motor vehicle (i) after his driver's license has been revoked for certain offenses, (ii) in violation of the terms of a restricted license, (iii) without an ignition interlock system if one is required, or (iv) if the person's license had been restricted, suspended, or revoked for certain driving under the influence offenses, with a blood alcohol content of 0.02 percent or more, only if such person was driving or operating the motor vehicle on a highway, as defined in ยง 46.2-100.
Title
Driving after forfeiture of license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17100607D-E |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB862E |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100607D |