VA SB860 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Satisfaction of judgment required to be noted by creditor. Requires a creditor to note satisfaction of a judgment only when it has been fully paid.
Title
Creditor; satisfaction of judgment required to be noted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 553 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB860ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Pending question ordered (27-Y 13-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102329D |