VA SB859 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Assigned P & E sub: Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections: Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; emergency absentee voting by and late applications for persons hospitalized; definition of hospital. Amends the definition of hospital, for purposes of emergency absentee voting by or late absentee ballot applications for persons who have been hospitalized, so that it is not limited to hospitals in Virginia, the District of Columbia, or a state contiguous to Virginia. The bill also removes the requirement that a person submitting a late absentee ballot application due to the hospitalization of himself or a member of his immediate family or to the death of a member of his immediate family must be absent from his county or city on election day in order to be eligible for the late absentee ballot application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; emergency absentee voting by and late applications for persons hospitalized.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-20SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103568D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242705(n/a)See Bill Text
242705.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback