VA SB856 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Elections; increasing membership ; Commissioner of Elections; role and eligibility; report. Increases the membership of the State Board of Elections from three members to five members. Representation is given to each of the political parties having the highest and next highest number of votes in the Commonwealth at the preceding gubernatorial election, with three Board members being of the party of the Governor. Terms are initially staggered. The bill provides that a Commissioner of Elections, who acts as the principal administrative officer of the Department of Elections, shall be appointed by the Governor. Persons engaging in certain partisan activities, persons related to persons engaging in certain partisan activities, and persons related to members of the State Board are prohibited from serving as the Commissioner of Elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, State Board of; increasing membership and terms, role and eligibility, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-21HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 2-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2020-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103597D-E
2020-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB856E
2020-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-31SenateRead second time
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (11-Y 2-N)
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced bill reprinted 20103597D
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103597D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242102(n/a)See Bill Text
242103(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback