VA SB853 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; assistance for certain voters. Allows any qualified voter who is 75 years of age or older or a person with a disability to request to go to the front of the line and to vote at the next available voting booth or voting system. The bill requires the chief officer of election or other designated election official to grant any such request made between the hours of 9:30 a.m. and 4:30 p.m. This provision applies also to central absentee voting precincts and locations in the county or city approved by the electoral board for the purpose of casting absentee ballots, but exempts polling places located in a nursing home, assisted living facility, or continuing care retirement community. A qualified voter who is 65 years of age or older or a person with a disability is still permitted to vote outside the polling place pursuant to § 24.2-649.
Title
Elections; assistance for qualified voter who is 75 years of age or older or person with disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103705D-ES1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB853ES1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15103705D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB1073 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15103705D-S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Elections |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103133D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1073 (Similar To) 2015-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |