VA SB851 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospital discharge procedures; designation of individual to receive information and instructions. Requires hospitals to provide each patient admitted as an inpatient or his legal guardian the opportunity to designate an individual who will care for or assist the patient in his residence following discharge from the hospital and to whom the hospital shall provide information regarding the patient's discharge plan and any follow-up care, treatment, and services that the patient may require.
Title
Hospital discharge procedures; designation of individual to receive information and instructions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB851ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB851S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104328D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104328D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101156D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1413 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)