VA SB845 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative speech or debate of local elected officials. Provides that an elected member of a local governing body shall not be compelled by law to be questioned on any speech or debate engaged in by the elected member during the exercise of his legislative powers without leave of court.
Title
Local officials; shall not be questioned on any legislative speech, etc., without leave of court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 15 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Chair votes Yes | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB845S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104385D-S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104385D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100777D |