VA SB843 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Stormwater and erosion and sediment control; acceptance of plans in lieu of plan review. Authorizes the State Water Control Board or the Department of Environmental Quality, in its administration of a Virginia Stormwater Management Program, Virginia Erosion and Stormwater Management Program, or Virginia Erosion and Sediment Control Program, to choose to accept a set of plans and supporting calculations for any land-disturbing activity determined to be de minimus using a risk-based approach established by the Board. The bill provides that such plans and supporting calculations shall satisfy the requirement that the Board or the Department retain a certified plan reviewer or conduct a plan review. The bill also directs the Board to adopt implementing regulations and provides requirements for the process of adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stormwater and erosion and sediment control; acceptance of plans in lieu of plan review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB843ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99--Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseRead third time
2020-02-28HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102941D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:27.4(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:56.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback