VA SB84 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary registration of fleet vehicles; penalty. Provides that the Department of Motor Vehicles may issue to fleet logistics providers, defined in the bill, a temporary registration for certain fleet vehicles. The bill requires that such temporary registration expire on receipt of permanent license plates from the Department or another jurisdiction, or 30 days from issuance, whichever occurs first.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fleet vehicles; temporary registration, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB84ER)
2018-03-01SenateEnrolled
2018-02-27HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseRead third time
2018-02-26HouseRead second time
2018-02-22HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenatePrinted as engrossed 18102054D-E
2018-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB84E
2018-01-29SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-01-29SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-01-29SenateRead second time
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2017-12-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-12-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102054D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462654.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB84
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB84+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB84E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB84ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0355+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0023+SB0084
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0162SB0084+SB0084
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0039+SB0084
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0206SB0084+SB0084
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1901V0043+SB0084
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H19V0131+SB0084
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1057+SB0084

Bill Comments

feedback