VA SB826 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB826

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Water and sewer service charges; tenant or lessee. Reduces the maximum potential responsibility of a property owner for a tenant's unpaid water and sewer charges by capping the dollar amount of such property owner's responsibility at $300.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water and sewer service charges; tenant or lessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseContinued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
2020-02-26HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-26HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103958D-E
2020-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB826E
2020-01-22SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-22SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-22SenateRead second time
2020-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103958D

Same As/Similar To

SB826 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522119.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB826
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB826+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB826E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB826AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB826AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB826F164+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S07C0020+SB0826
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0109SB0826+SB0826
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0133SB0826+SB0826
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0702C0132+SB0826
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H07C0112+SB0826

Bill Comments

feedback