VA SB824 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Substance Abuse Services Council; name change; membership. Renames the Substance Abuse Services Council as the Virginia Addiction Recovery Council and increases from 29 to 32 the membership of the Council by adding two members representing the problem gambling recovery community and one member representing the board of directors of the Opiod Abatement Authority. Substance Abuse Services Council; name change; membership. Renames the Substance Abuse Services Council as the Virginia Addiction Recovery Council and increases from 29 to 32 the membership of the Council by adding two members representing the problem gambling recovery community and one member representing the board of directors of the Opiod Abatement Authority.
Title
Substance Abuse Services Council; name change, membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466) | |
2023-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB824ER) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102262D-E |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB824E |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102262D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2696 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |