VA SB812 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of qualified mental health professional. Broadens the definition of "qualified mental health professional" to include employees and independent contractors of the Department of Corrections who by education and experience are professionally qualified and registered by the Board of Counseling to provide collaborative mental health services. This bill is identical to HB 1375.
Title
Mental health professional, qualified; broadens definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803) | |
2018-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB812ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104502D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2400.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |