VA SB8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting on Sundays. Permits hunting on Sunday on public or private land, so long as it takes place more than 200 yards from a place of worship. Hunting on Sundays. Permits hunting on Sunday on public or private land, so long as it takes place more than 200 yards from a place of worship.
Title
Hunting on Sundays; permits hunting on public or private land, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 28-N) (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098) | |
2022-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 98 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB8ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 28-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House (69-Y 28-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB8S1 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104683D-S1 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104683D-S1 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100943D |