VA SB795 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Offshore oil and gas drilling; prohibition on leases; policy. Prohibits the granting of a lease, easement, or permit on the beds of the coastal waters of the Commonwealth that would allow any infrastructure for conveying to shore oil or gas produced from offshore drilling in the Outer Continental Shelf Planning Area and removes any oil or gas lease granted on such beds from the mandate that such lease include a royalty payment requirement. The bill removes policy statements supporting federal efforts to permit oil and gas development 50 miles or more off the Atlantic shoreline.
Title
Offshore drilling; prohibition on leases, policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 452 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB795ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 20108596D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (61-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB795H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108596D-H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108596D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20106327D-ES1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB795ES1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Lewis agreed to |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB795S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106327D-S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106327D-S1 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103660D |
Same As/Similar To
HB706 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)