VA SB794 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-16 - Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-16 - Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
City of Chesapeake; pilot program for problem-solving docket. Authorizes the City of Chesapeake to establish a pilot program to promote public safety and reduce recidivism by creating a problem-solving docket to address substance abuse, mental illness, issues unique to military service experienced by veterans, and issues related to previously incarcerated persons. The bill directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, and the Department of Veterans Services to provide assistance to the City of Chesapeake as requested. The bill provides for the City of Chesapeake to report on the pilot program to the Commissioners of the assisting agencies on or before November 30, 2018. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2019.
Title
City of Chesapeake; pilot program for problem-solving docket.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-16 | Senate | Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100341D |
Subjects
Chesapeake City of
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation