VA SB793 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Summary
Administration of oath of office. Allows a person elected or appointed to an office in the Commonwealth that requires an oath of office to make such oath before any notary public, if such person is a member of the United States Armed Forces and is on active duty, or if such person is a civilian deployed by the United States Department of Defense. The act will be enforced from the date of its passage. This bill is identical to
Title
Oath of office; person elected to State office make oath before notary if in US Armed Forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 713 (effective 3/27/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB793ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Emergency clause added | |
2008-03-06 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendment (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB793H1 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to | |
2008-03-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 089596212-H1 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 089596212-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 087677212-E | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB793E | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 087677212 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Same As/Similar To
HB1575 (Same As) 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB793 |