VA SB783 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning; clustering. Provides that a cluster development is otherwise subject to applicable land use ordinances of the locality; however, the locality shall not impose more stringent land use requirements for such cluster development. Also, the locality shall not prohibit extension of water or sewer from an adjacent property to a cluster development provided the cluster development is located within an area designated for water and sewer service by a county, city, or town.
Title
Zoning; cluster development subject to land use ordinance of locality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 519 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB783ER) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 28-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House with amendment (70-Y 28-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-15 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB783S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104616D-S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104616D-S1 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-12-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-12-28 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102986D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2223.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2286.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |