VA SB781 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transport of prisoners. Provides that the sheriff or administrator in charge of a local or regional correctional facility and the employees of the facility acting on the direction of such sheriff or administrator have the authority to transport a prisoner for a lawful purpose (i) to another jurisdiction inside the Commonwealth and retain authority over such prisoner or (ii) through or to another state and retain authority over such prisoner as allowed by such state.
Title
Correctional facilities, local; facilities transporting prisoners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB781ER) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Title replaced 16105951D-H1 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB781H1 |
2016-03-02 | House | Substitute by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to 16105951D-H1 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | House | Floor substitute printed 16105951D-H1 (Lingamfelter) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16105245D |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |