VA SB773 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Heritage trail for motor racing locations in Virginia. Directs the Virginia Tourism Corporation to convene a group of stakeholders to initiate the creation, design, and implementation of a NASCAR and motor vehicle racing heritage trail.
Title
Heritage trail; creation for motor racing locations in Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1184) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1184 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB773ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB773S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106608D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106608D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100384D |