VA SB772 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation of bait fish for sale; penalty. Prohibits the transportation for sale outside of the Commonwealth of river herring, alewife, threadfin shad, or gizzard shad, or the carcass or any part thereof, collected from the inland waters for use as bait fish. A violation of the provisions of the bill constitutes a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Bait fish; unlawful to transport for sale outside of the Commonwealth, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (11-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (11-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 808 (effective 4/7/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB772ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendment (96-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB772S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Stanley agreed to 20106832D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20106832D-S1 (Stanley) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (11-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100784D |