VA SB770 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Virginia Chief Workforce Advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Paid family and medical leave program. Requires the Virginia Employment Commission to establish and administer a paid family and medical leave program with benefits beginning January 1, 2023. Under the program, benefits are paid to eligible employees for family and medical leave. Funding for the program is provided through premiums assessed to employers and employees beginning in 2022. The amount of a benefit is 80 percent of the employee's average weekly wage, not to exceed 80 percent of the state weekly wage, which amount is required to be adjusted annually to reflect changes in the statewide average weekly wage. The measure caps the duration of paid leave at 12 weeks in any application year. The bill provides self-employed individuals the option of participating in the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid family and medical leave program; Virginia Employment Commission to establish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Virginia Chief Workforce Advisor
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Secretary of Commerce and Trade
2020-02-04SenatePassed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations with letter (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104823D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
602800(n/a)See Bill Text
602819(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback