VA SB767 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Failed to report (defeated) in Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Failed to report (defeated) in Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; payment to out-of-network providers. Provides that when a covered person receives covered emergency services from an out-of-network health care provider or receives out-of-network services at an in-network facility, the covered person is not required to pay the out-of-network provider any amount other than the applicable cost-sharing requirement. The measure also establishes a standard for calculating the health carrier's required payment to the out-of-network provider of the services, which standard is the lower of the market-based value for the service or 125 percent of the amount that would be paid under Medicare for the service. If such provider determines that the amount to be paid by the health carrier does not comply with the applicable requirements, the measure requires the provider and the health carrier to make a good faith effort to reach a resolution on the appropriate amount of the reimbursement and, if a resolution is not reached, authorizes either party to request the State Corporation Commission to review the disputed reimbursement amount and determine if the amount complies with applicable requirements. The measure provides that such provisions do not apply to an entity that provides or administers self-insured or self-funded plans; however, such entities may elect to be subject such provisions. The measure requires health carriers to make reports to the Bureau of Insurance and directs the Bureau to provide reports to certain committees of the General Assembly.
Title
Health insurance; payment to out-of-network providers.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. John Petersen [D] |
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. William Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 8-N) (Y: 8 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20108079D-S2 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106513D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104875D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3445.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |