VA SB761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; recovery of costs; rate adjustment clause proceedings; construction or acquisition of certain facilities. Provides that in any proceeding regarding petitions for a rate adjustment clause, the State Corporation Commission may, as an alternative to a rate adjustment clause, authorize recovery of any proposed cost through the utility's rates for generation and distribution services, if the Commission, in its discretion, determines that such cost recovery better serves ratepayers while still providing the utility the opportunity to recover its costs and earn a fair rate of return. Additionally, the bill prohibits the Commission from approving the recovery of costs related to the construction or acquisition of generation facilities powered by sunlight or onshore or offshore wind, or energy storage facilities, that are constructed or acquired by a Phase I or Phase II Utility after July 1, 2022, unless the Commission determines that the construction or acquisition of such facilities is (i) necessary to maintain the reliability or security of electric service to customers or meet the renewable energy portfolio standard (RPS) program requirements established in this section and (ii) is the lowest-cost option to maintain the reliability or security of electric service to customers or meet the RPS program requirements.
Title
Electric utilities; recovery of costs, rate adjustment clause proceedings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104566D |