VA SB761 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal injury and wrongful death actions; disclosure of address of insured person. Requires an insurance company to disclose the address of an alleged tortfeasor upon request of an injured person, personal representative, or attorney in a cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death due to a motor vehicle accident, if such address has not previously been disclosed. The bill also provides that if the alleged tortfeasor has insurance coverage from a self-insured locality for a motor vehicle accident and the locality is authorized by the alleged tortfeasor to accept service of process, the locality may instead disclose the insured's work address and the name and address of the person who shall accept service of process on behalf of the alleged tortfeasor.
Title
Personal injury and wrongful death actions; disclosure of address of alleged tortfeasor, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 711 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB761ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105051D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB761H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105051D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105051D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-23 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100871D |