VA SB750 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB750
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral Health Hospital Authority; established. Creates the Behavioral Health Hospital Authority (the Authority) as an independent political subdivision of the Commonwealth, to control the delivery, financing, utilization, and health outcomes of public acute inpatient psychiatric services in the Commonwealth, and transfers responsibility for the Commonwealth's state hospitals for individuals with mental illness from the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to the Authority.
Title
Behavioral Health Hospital Authority; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105886D-S1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104520D |
Same As/Similar To
SB750 (Carry Over) 2022-02-08 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Authorities
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Authorities
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 346.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1839 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2818 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 283 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 59 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 805.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 824 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 828 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 837 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 841 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 28.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1229 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2028 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |