VA SB750 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Richmond; equal educational opportunities; school infrastructure. Requires the mayor of the City of Richmond to present to the city council not later than January 1, 2019, a fully funded plan to modernize the city's K-12 educational infrastructure consistent with national standards or inform city council that such a plan is not feasible. The bill prohibits basing the fully funded plan on the passage of new or increased taxes for that purpose.
Title
Richmond, City of; amending charter, equal educational.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB750ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100974D |