VA SB750 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act. Establishes a mechanism for resolving multistate jurisdictional disputes regarding adult guardianships and conservatorships. Procedures are provided for determining which jurisdiction is the "home state" having primary jurisdiction, transferring a guardianship or conservatorship to another state, registering orders, and addressing emergency situations. The Act has been adopted in 19 states and the District of Columbia.
Title
Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB750ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Title replaced 11105457D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB750H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Amendment by Delegate Albo agreed to | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105457D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105457D-H1 | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting by voice vote | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-11-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-11-15 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100660D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1031 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1052 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |