VA SB744 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Boards of zoning appeals; City of Portsmouth. Adds the City of Portsmouth to a provision requiring the governing body to appoint members and alternates to the board of zoning appeals. Under the general law, the circuit court appoints the members of a locality's board of zoning appeals.
Title
Portsmouth, City of; members, etc., of board of zoning appeals shall be appointed by governing body.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 407 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB744ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendment (93-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101834D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1758 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)