VA SB741 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management; termination of general permit; notice. Requires a Virginia Stormwater Management Program Authority (VSMP authority) to recommend that the Department of Environmental Quality terminate coverage under a General Permit for Discharges of Stormwater from Construction Activities within 60 days of receiving a complete notice of termination from the operator of the construction activity. The bill (i) provides that such permit coverage shall be deemed terminated 90 days after the receipt by the VSMP authority of a complete notice of termination and (ii) requires any VSMP authority receiving incomplete notice to inform the operator within a reasonable time and provide a detailed list of the missing elements.
Title
Stormwater management; termination of general permit, notice.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB741ER) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18102671D-E |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB741E |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102671D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:26.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |