VA SB740 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

County and city precincts; required to be wholly contained within election districts; waiver for administration of split precinct. Requires each county and city precinct to be wholly contained within a single congressional district, Senate district, House of Delegates district, and local election district. By July 1 of each year ending in one, the governing body of each county and city is required to establish the precinct boundaries to be consistent with any congressional district, Senate district, House of Delegates district, and local election district that was adopted by the appropriate authority by June 15 of that year. If a governing body is unable to establish a precinct with the minimum number of registered voters without splitting the precinct between two or more congressional districts, Senate districts, House of Delegates districts, or local election districts, it is required to apply to the State Board of Elections for a waiver to administer a split precinct. The State Board is authorized to grant the waiver or to direct the establishment of a precinct with less than the minimum number of registered voters as permitted by current law. A governing body that is granted a waiver to administer a split precinct or is directed to establish a precinct with fewer than the minimum number of voters is permitted to use that precinct for any election held that year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County and city precincts; required to be wholly contained within election districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 4-N) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB740ER)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (91-Y 4-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (91-Y 4-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Lindsey, Simon, Runion
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Obenshain, Barker, Surovell
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-05HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute (96-Y 2-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB740H1
2020-03-04HousePassed by temporarily
2020-03-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109368D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109368D-H1
2020-02-28HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB740S1
2020-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106352D-S1
2020-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-24SenateRead second time
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106352D-S1
2020-01-21SenateIncorporates SB121 (Barker)
2020-01-21SenateIncorporates SB119 (Peake)
2020-01-21SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102798D

Same As/Similar To

SB119 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB121 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB740&201+sum+SB740
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB740+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB740S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB740H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB740ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S08V0060+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0135SB0740+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0168SB0740+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1802V0013+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H18V0145+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1821+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1559SB0740+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1648SB0740+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1832SB0740+SB0740
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2100+SB0740

Bill Comments

feedback