VA SB736 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Days of operation of clerks' offices; clerks' authority to close office. Allows the clerk of the circuit court of any county or city to close the clerk's office on (i) Christmas Eve; (ii) any day or portion of a day that the Governor declares as a holiday for state employees; and (iii) any day or portion of a day on which the Governor, Supreme Court, or Judicial Council authorizes state offices to be closed. Under current law, the clerk may only close the clerk's office once a judge authorizes such clerk to do so in these circumstances.
Title
Clerks' offices; days of operation, clerks' authority to close office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB736ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 24107807D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute (85-Y 14-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB736H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107807D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107807D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24105101D-E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB736E |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24105101D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1396 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)