VA SB733 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempted vehicles; insurance. Requires motor vehicles, trailers, and semi-trailers exempted from the registration requirement to be covered by motor vehicle insurance; a general liability policy; or an umbrella or excess insurance policy. The bill requires the owner of any such motor vehicle, trailer, or semi-trailer to provide proof of insurance within 30 days when requested by a law-enforcement officer and provides that failure to do so is punishable as a traffic infraction by a fine of $600 to be paid into the Uninsured Motorists Fund. Exempted vehicles; insurance. Requires motor vehicles, trailers, and semi-trailers exempted from the registration requirement to be covered by motor vehicle insurance; a general liability policy; or an umbrella or excess insurance policy. The bill requires the owner of any such motor vehicle, trailer, or semi-trailer to provide proof of insurance within 30 days when requested by a law-enforcement officer and provides that failure to do so is punishable as a traffic infraction by a fine of $600 to be paid into the Uninsured Motorists Fund.
Title
Exempted vehicles; insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB733ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB733ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104317D |