VA SB732 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crash reports; contracted service providers. Authorizes law-enforcement agencies to utilize a contracted service provider to forward crash reports electronically to the Department of Motor Vehicles and manage or disseminate copies of certain crash reports as authorized by law. The bill authorizes the release of nonpersonally identifiable vehicle information from crash reports to a contracted service provider.
Title
Crash reports; contracted service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080) | |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB732ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24105273D-E |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB732E |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24105273D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1409 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)