VA SB730 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Custodial interrogations; recording. Provides that any law-enforcement officer shall, if practicable, make an audiovisual recording of the entirety any custodial interrogation of a person conducted in a place of detention. The bill provides that if an audiovisual recording is unable to be made, the law-enforcement officer shall make an audio recording of the custodial interrogation. The bill provides that the failure of a law-enforcement officer to make such a recording shall not affect the admissibility of the statements made during the custodial interrogation, but the court or jury may consider such failure in determining the weight given to such evidence. As introduced this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custodial interrogations; recording.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108511D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB730S1
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107866D-S1
2020-02-10SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107866D-S1
2020-02-05SenateIncorporates SB305 (Stanley)
2020-02-05SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101839D

Same As/Similar To

SB305 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192390.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback