VA SB730 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Major Employment and Investment Project Site Planning Grant Fund. Establishes the Major Employment and Investment Project Site Planning Grant Fund to award grants to political subdivisions to assist in site development work for certain prospective projects. The bill provides that the Fund will sunset on July 1, 2014, if no appropriation has been made by the General Assembly, or no gifts, grants, or donations have been made from public or private sources to the Fund by that date.
Title
Major Employment and Investment Project Site Planning Grant Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB730ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104501D | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Introduced at the request of Governor |