VA SB727 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exemptions; courts of record; courts not of record; the Office of the Executive Secretary. Exempts the judiciary, including courts of record, courts not of record, and the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia, from the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. The bill directs the Supreme Court of Virginia to develop Rules of Court to govern public access to records in the custody of the judiciary.
Title
FOIA; exemptions for courts of record, courts not of records, and Office of the Executive Secretary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18104644D-E |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB727E |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104644D |