VA SB71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Grand larceny; first offender. Allows the court to defer disposition for a person charged with larceny who has not previously been convicted of or charged with a felony, an offense related to larceny, embezzlement, fraud, or any crime of moral turpitude. As a condition of probation the court must require the defendant to complete any required treatment or education program, make a reasonable effort to secure and maintain employment, perform community service, and make restitution.
Title
Larceny; court may require accused to undergo an assessment and enter treatment program, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB71S1 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB71S1 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104400D-S1 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104400D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103504D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 108.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 152.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 188 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 197 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 96 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 96.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 97 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |